LMS Cooke "G1" Class 0-8-0
Class | LNWR | LNWR (ORIG) | LMS | LMS (1930) | LMS (Dup.) | LMS (Correct) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
G1 | 2570 | 9367 | 49367 | 10/1902 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/11/1957 |
02/11/1957 | ||||
G1 | 2525 | 50 | 9008 | 49008 | 09/1893 | 8B 8C 8F W |
Warrington Dallam Speke Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/11/1958 15/08/1959 08/12/1962 |
08/12/1962 | |||
G1 | 2526 | 9043 | 49043 | 11/1894 | 10A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1949 |
09/1949 | ||||
G1 | 2527 | 9051 | 49051 | 11/1894 | 9D 4D 85C 84G W |
Buxton (LNWR) Abergavenny Hereford Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 04/12/1954 26/03/1955 28/02/1957 |
15/02/1957 | ||||
G1 | 2528 | 9027 | 49027 | 11/1894 | 8C 10C W |
Speke Junction Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/03/1948 21/11/1959 |
21/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 2529 | 8954 | 48954 | 11/1894 | 10E W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 |
16/07/1949 | ||||
G1 | 2530 | 9049 | 49049 | 02/1895 | 2A 2B 2B 2A 10A W |
Rugby Bletchley Bletchley Rugby Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/12/1949 14/01/1950 13/08/1955 25/01/1958 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 2532 | 9029 | 49029 | 02/1895 | 1A 10A W |
Willesden Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 01/01/1948 13/05/1950 |
13/05/1950 | ||||
G1 | 2536 | 9033 | 49033 | 08/1896 | 4B W |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1957 |
10/12/1957 | ||||
G1 | 2537 | 9019 | 49019 | 08/1896 | 4D W |
Abergavenny Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1949 |
06/1949 | ||||
G1 | 2538 | 8962 | 48962 | 08/1896 | 5B 10A W |
Crewe South Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 28/02/1948 12/1948 |
12/1948 | ||||
G1 | 2539 | 9031 | 49031 | 08/1896 | 3C W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1951 |
05/1951 | ||||
G1 | 2540 | 9020 | 49020 | 08/1896 | 8D 3A 3C 8F W |
Widnes Bescot Ryecroft (Walsall) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/05/1951 16/06/1951 14/06/1958 07/10/1961 |
07/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 2541 | 8953 | 48953 | 08/1896 | 1A 2D 2D 2B 3A 4A 4A W |
Willesden Nuneaton Nuneaton Bletchley Bescot Bletchley Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/07/1949 16/07/1949 15/10/1949 02/12/1950 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 07/10/1961 |
07/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 2544 | 9040 | 49040 | 08/1896 | 3C W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 | ||||
G1 | 2547 | 9012 | 49012 | 09/1896 | 1A W |
Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 |
11/12/1948 | ||||
G1 | 2548 | 9004 | 49004 | 09/1896 | 2C 2A 2F W |
Northampton Rugby Coventry Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1948 30/04/1949 06/1949 |
06/1949 | ||||
G1 | 2551 | 9034 | 49034 | 12/1896 | 3A 5C 10A 10A 10D 10D 10C W |
Bescot Stafford Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Plodder Lane Plodder Lane Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/07/1948 19/08/1950 09/09/1950 28/10/1950 04/11/1950 09/10/1954 22/09/1962 |
22/09/1962 | ||||
G1 | 2552 | 9052 | 49052 | 12/1896 | 6B 10C W |
Mold Junction Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1802 | 9016 | 49016 | 10/1897 | 8A 4D W |
Edge Hill Abergavenny Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1804 | 9017 | 49017 | 10/1897 | 3D W |
Aston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1952 |
06/1952 | ||||
G1 | 1808 | 9047 | 49047 | 10/1897 | 6B 5B 5C W |
Mold Junction Crewe South Stafford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 16/10/1948 04/01/1958 |
04/01/1958 | ||||
G1 | 1812 | 9014 | 29014 | 9014 | 49014 | 10/1897 | 10A 10B 2D 2B W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Preston Nuneaton Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/04/1949 01/10/1949 29/10/1949 05/1951 |
05/1951 | ||
G1 | 1813 | 9060 | 49060 | 11/1897 | 8C W |
Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1815 | 9044 | 49044 | 11/1897 | 3A 3B W |
Bescot Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/03/1949 24/10/1959 |
24/10/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1816 | 9045 | 49045 | 11/1897 | 3A 3D 3A 2B 21B W |
Bescot Aston Bescot Nuneaton Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/03/1957 29/11/1958 24/02/1962 05/05/1962 22/12/1962 |
22/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1818 | 9013 | 49013 | 12/1897 | 2A W |
Rugby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1948 |
04/1948 | ||||
G1 | 1819 | 9058 | 49058 | 12/1897 | 8D 2D 2D 3C W |
Widnes Nuneaton Nuneaton Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 20/08/1949 03/1950 |
03/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1820 | 9050 | 49050 | 01/1898 | 3A 10A W |
Bescot Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1950 10/1950 |
10/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1821 | 9064 | 49064 | 04/1898 | 4E 8A W |
Tredegar Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/09/1959 04/06/1960 |
04/06/1960 | ||||
G1 | 1822 | 9005 | 49005 | 04/1898 | 2B 1E W |
Bletchley Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/08/1955 10/08/1957 |
10/08/1957 | ||||
G1 | 1824 | 9035 | 49035 | 04/1898 | 4B W |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1957 |
24/01/1957 | ||||
G1 | 1825 | 9053 | 49053 | 04/1898 | 10A 10E 10E W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 05/1950 |
05/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1827 | 9018 | 49018 | 05/1898 | 20B 10A 4A 10A 10A W |
Stourton Springs Branch (Wigan) Bletchley Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 12/08/1950 26/08/1950 09/09/1950 05/09/1959 |
05/09/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1830 | 9041 | 49041 | 05/1898 | 1A W |
Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1950 |
08/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1831 | 9039 | 49039 | 07/1898 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 |
14/01/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1832 | 9038 | 49038 | 07/1898 | 8D 8A W |
Widnes Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1948 04/1948 |
04/1948 | ||||
G1 | 1833 | 9009 | 49009 | 07/1898 | 9D 10D 6B 6B 3A 2B 3A 8F W |
Buxton (LNWR) Plodder Lane Mold Junction Mold Junction Bescot Nuneaton Bescot Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 31/12/1949 14/01/1950 04/02/1950 06/11/1954 04/12/1954 21/02/1959 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1834 | 9028 | 49028 | 07/1898 | 4A 4D 85C 84G W |
Shrewsbury Abergavenny Hereford Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 04/12/1954 26/03/1955 03/03/1956 |
03/03/1956 | ||||
G1 | 1836 | 9061 | 49061 | 07/1898 | 2A 2B 5C 1E W |
Rugby Bletchley Stafford Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1948 01/12/1956 29/12/1956 07/10/1961 |
07/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 1837 | 9055 | 49055 | 07/1898 | 19C 20B 6B W |
Canklow Stourton Mold Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1948 19/06/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1838 | 9032 | 49032 | 08/1898 | 5B 8A 8C 10A W |
Crewe South Edge Hill Speke Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 08/10/1949 12/11/1949 03/06/1950 |
03/06/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1839 | 9010 | 49010 | 08/1898 | 2D 9B W |
Nuneaton Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 01/01/1948 06/06/1959 |
06/06/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1842 | 8966 | 48966 | 10/1898 | 8A 8C 3C 6B 6B W |
Edge Hill Speke Junction Ryecroft (Walsall) Mold Junction Mold Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/04/1949 29/10/1949 31/12/1949 14/01/1950 18/02/1950 |
18/02/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1843 | 9048 | 49048 | 10/1898 | 3C 5C 5B W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Stafford Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/03/1955 14/06/1958 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1845 | 9003 | 49003 | 10/1898 | 3C W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1846 | 9059 | 49059 | 10/1898 | 9D 6B 3A W |
Buxton (LNWR) Mold Junction Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/05/1948 26/03/1949 11/02/1950 |
11/02/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1848 | 9022 | 49022 | 10/1898 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1951 |
05/1951 | ||||
G1 | 1853 | 9036 | 49036 | 02/1899 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1949 |
12/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1854 | 9023 | 49023 | 02/1899 | 10A 11A 10A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Carnforth Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 31/07/1948 07/10/1961 |
07/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 1855 | 8964 | 48964 | 02/1899 | 1C 2B 2B 4A 3A W |
Watford Bletchley Bletchley Bletchley Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 07/10/1950 19/05/1951 21/04/1962 |
21/04/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1856 | 9026 | 49026 | 02/1899 | 10A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1949 |
09/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1857 | 9042 | 49042 | 02/1899 | 2C 2A W |
Northampton Rugby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1863 | 9006 | 49006 | 05/1899 | 4D 8A 4D W |
Abergavenny Edge Hill Abergavenny Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/08/1948 18/09/1948 26/05/1951 |
26/05/1951 | ||||
G1 | 1864 | 9063 | 49063 | 05/1899 | 3A 3D 3A W |
Bescot Aston Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/03/1957 29/11/1958 29/08/1959 |
29/08/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1865 | 9062 | 49062 | 05/1899 | 1A W |
Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/05/1951 |
26/05/1951 | ||||
G1 | 1866 | 9002 | 49002 | 05/1899 | 9A 9B 2B 2B 8A 8F W |
Longsight Stockport Edgeley Nuneaton Nuneaton Edge Hill Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/03/1950 14/04/1951 19/05/1951 28/01/1961 09/09/1961 15/09/1962 |
15/09/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1868 | 9056 | 49056 | 05/1899 | 3C W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1948 |
08/1948 | ||||
G1 | 1870 | 9057 | 49057 | 05/1899 | 8C 6B 9D W |
Speke Junction Mold Junction Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/03/1948 03/07/1948 18/05/1957 |
18/05/1957 | ||||
G1 | 1871 | 9030 | 49030 | 04/1900 | 10A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/06/1951 |
23/06/1951 | ||||
G1 | 1872 | 9015 | 49015 | 05/1900 | 3C W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1873 | 9007 | 49007 | 05/1900 | 2B 10A 10A 9B 10A W |
Bletchley Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Stockport Edgeley Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/03/1951 24/03/1951 25/02/1956 21/04/1956 07/10/1961 |
07/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 1874 | 9054 | 49054 | 05/1900 | 9A W |
Longsight Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1876 | 9021 | 49021 | 05/1900 | 1A 3A 3A 2A 3A W |
Willesden Bescot Bescot Rugby Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/03/1951 24/03/1951 25/02/1956 11/08/1956 07/10/1961 |
07/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 1877 | 9046 | 49046 | 05/1900 | 4A 4A 4D 85C S 85C W |
Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Abergavenny Hereford Stored Hereford (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/03/1948 18/06/1949 01/01/1955 09/10/1955 28/11/1955 31/03/1957 |
08/03/1957 | ||||
G1 | 1878 | 9024 | 49024 | 05/1900 | 10A 9B 9B 8B 8B 2C W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Stockport Edgeley Stockport Edgeley Warrington Dallam Warrington Dallam Warwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 06/11/1954 23/02/1957 |
23/02/1957 | ||||
G1 | 1879 | 9025 | 49025 | 05/1900 | 3A 10A 10A 5B 10A W |
Bescot Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Crewe South Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 03/11/1956 26/01/1957 15/09/1962 |
15/09/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1880 | 9037 | 49037 | 05/1900 | 2B 3B 8A W |
Bletchley Bushbury Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/04/1949 12/11/1960 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1882 | 9344 | 49344 | 09/1901 | 1C 1A 8F W |
Watford Willesden Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 28/01/1961 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1883 | 9319 | 49319 | 09/1901 | 2A 5C 5B W |
Rugby Stafford Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 10/12/1949 10/1950 |
10/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1884 | 9266 | 49266 | 09/1901 | 3A 8C 2C 2A W |
Bescot Speke Junction Warwick Rugby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1954 23/03/1957 04/10/1958 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1885 | 9267 | 49267 | 09/1901 | 5B 10B 10A W |
Crewe South Preston Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 20/04/1957 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1886 | 9390 | 49390 | 09/1901 | 25G 10B W |
Farnley Junction Preston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/04/1949 21/12/1957 |
21/12/1957 | ||||
G1 | 1887 | 9148 | 49148 | 09/1901 | 4D 4B W |
Abergavenny Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 31/07/1957 |
31/07/1957 | ||||
G1 | 1888 | 9600 | 8892 | 48892 | 09/1901 | 2F 2F W |
Coventry Coventry Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 01/1949 |
01/1949 | |||
G1 | 1889 | 9345 | 49345 | 09/1901 | 2D 4D 84G W |
Nuneaton Abergavenny Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/10/1949 04/12/1954 31/01/1958 |
31/01/1958 | ||||
G1 | 1890 | 8901 | 48901 | 09/1901 | 2A 4A W |
Rugby Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/09/1948 17/05/1952 |
17/05/1952 | ||||
G1 | 1891 | 9348 | 49348 | 12/1901 | 10B 9D W |
Preston Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1892 | 8902 | 48902 | 12/1901 | 2B 2D 3B 3D W |
Bletchley Nuneaton Bushbury Aston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 15/10/1949 12/07/1952 21/02/1953 |
21/02/1953 | ||||
G1 | 1893 | 9085 | 49085 | 12/1901 | 8B W |
Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/08/1950 |
12/08/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1894 | 9391 | 49391 | 12/1901 | 2B 10B 10E 9D W |
Bletchley Preston Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 17/01/1959 20/01/1962 |
20/01/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1895 | 9066 | 49066 | 12/1901 | 8C 3C W |
Speke Junction Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/03/1948 02/11/1957 |
02/11/1957 | ||||
G1 | 1896 | 9380 | 12/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1947 | 11/1947 | |||||
G1 | 1897 | 9370 | 49370 | 12/1901 | 5B 10C 3D W |
Crewe South Patricroft Aston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 14/01/1950 30/06/1951 |
30/06/1951 | ||||
G1 | 1898 | 9385 | 49385 | 12/1901 | 8A 2B 4A 4A 10A 10A W |
Edge Hill Bletchley Bletchley Bletchley Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/05/1950 30/06/1951 17/07/1951 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 21/12/1957 |
21/12/1957 | ||||
G1 | 1899 | 9382 | 49382 | 12/1901 | 25G 10B 24C 26F W |
Farnley Junction Preston Lostock Hall Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/04/1949 16/09/1961 23/09/1961 22/09/1962 |
22/09/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1900 | 9065 | 49065 | 12/1901 | 8C 10D W |
Speke Junction Plodder Lane Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/07/1948 03/1950 |
03/1950 | ||||
G1 | 813 | 8903 | 48903 | 03/1902 | 10C W |
Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1949 |
09/1949 | ||||
G1 | 815 | 9375 | 49375 | 04/1902 | 1C 8A W |
Watford Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1951 08/12/1962 |
08/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 823 | 8904 | 48904 | 04/1902 | 1A 8C 1A 1A 3C W |
Willesden Speke Junction Willesden Willesden Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 01/01/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 16/04/1949 10/1949 |
10/1949 | ||||
G1 | 826 | 8905 | 48905 | 04/1902 | 3A 3C 8F W |
Bescot Ryecroft (Walsall) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/10/1951 14/06/1958 06/06/1959 |
06/06/1959 | ||||
G1 | 843 | 8906 | 48906 | 04/1902 | 5B 9A W |
Crewe South Longsight Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 | ||||
G1 | 859 | 9336 | 04/1902 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1947 | 07/1947 | |||||
G1 | 898 | 9146 | 49146 | 04/1902 | 4D 85C 87K W |
Abergavenny Hereford Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/12/1954 20/04/1957 28/02/1958 |
28/02/1958 | ||||
G1 | 899 | 9610 | 8896 | 48896 | 04/1902 | 2D 3A W |
Nuneaton Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/07/1948 01/1950 |
01/1950 | |||
G1 | 904 | 9337 | 49337 | 04/1902 | 2A 2E W |
Rugby Warwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/06/1948 16/07/1949 |
16/07/1949 | ||||
G1 | 405 | 8907 | 48907 | 05/1902 | 8D 3A 3C 3C W |
Widnes Bescot Ryecroft (Walsall) Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1948 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 28/09/1957 |
28/09/1957 | ||||
G1 | 2074 | 8908 | 48908 | 05/1902 | 8A 2C 2C 2F 3B 3B W |
Edge Hill Northampton Northampton Coventry Bushbury Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 18/12/1948 15/01/1949 09/07/1949 16/07/1949 09/09/1950 |
09/09/1950 | ||||
G1 | 2114 | 9386 | 49386 | 05/1902 | 9D 8B 10C W |
Buxton (LNWR) Warrington Dallam Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 29/04/1950 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 2342 | 8909 | 48909 | 05/1902 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1949 |
02/1949 | ||||
G1 | 2369 | 8910 | 48910 | 05/1902 | W 2E |
Withdrawn Warwick |
01/1948 01/01/1948 |
01/1948 | ||||
G1 | 2496 | 8911 | 48911 | 05/1902 | 2D 2F 3D 3D W |
Nuneaton Coventry Aston Aston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/01/1949 16/07/1949 23/07/1949 31/12/1949 |
31/12/1949 | ||||
G1 | 842 | 9338 | 49338 | 05/1902 | 8B W |
Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 | ||||
G1 | 906 | 9612 | 8897 | 48897 | 05/1902 | 2E W |
Warwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1949 |
10/1949 | |||
G1 | 2556 | 8912 | 48912 | 07/1902 | 10C W |
Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1948 |
08/1948 | ||||
G1 | 2557 | 8913 | 48913 | 08/1902 | 2B 5C W |
Bletchley Stafford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 08/1948 |
28/08/1948 | ||||
G1 | 2559 | 8914 | 48914 | 08/1902 | 2C 2A 2A W |
Northampton Rugby Rugby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 13/07/1957 |
13/07/1957 | ||||
G1 | 2560 | 8915 | 48915 | 08/1902 | 1C 10A W |
Watford Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/08/1956 07/10/1961 |
07/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 2562 | 9152 | 49152 | 08/1902 | 10E W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1948 |
09/1948 | ||||
G1 | 2563 | 9604 | 8893 | 48893 | 08/1902 | 4B 84G 87K 84G W |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Shrewsbury Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1951 21/03/1953 11/07/1953 31/10/1954 |
31/10/1954 | |||
G1 | 2564 | 8917 | 48917 | 08/1902 | 3A 3C 9D W |
Bescot Ryecroft (Walsall) Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/10/1951 10/08/1957 09/11/1957 |
09/11/1957 | ||||
G1 | 2251 | 9067 | 49067 | 09/1902 | 8D W |
Widnes Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1949 |
12/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1035 | 9133 | 49133 | 09/1902 | 2A 2F 2A 3C W |
Rugby Coventry Rugby Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1949 30/04/1949 04/06/1949 02/1950 |
02/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1036 | 9365 | 49365 | 09/1902 | 8C W |
Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 |
16/07/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1038 | 9349 | 49349 | 09/1902 | 3C W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1949 |
12/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1039 | 8918 | 48918 | 09/1902 | 10E W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1040 | 8920 | 48920 | 09/1902 | 10C W |
Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/05/1951 |
05/05/1951 | ||||
G1 | 1041 | 9355 | 49355 | 10/1902 | 8A W |
Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1043 | 9304 | 49304 | 10/1902 | 10C 2B 9G 2A 10D W |
Patricroft Bletchley Northwich Rugby Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/06/1950 11/09/1954 20/04/1957 05/10/1957 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 | ||||
G1 | 2566 | 9153 | 49153 | 10/1902 | 2C 8C W |
Northampton Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 2567 | 8921 | 48921 | 10/1902 | 4E 84G W |
Tredegar Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/03/1958 30/04/1958 |
30/04/1958 | ||||
G1 | 2568 | 9342 | 49342 | 10/1902 | 2D 1A 2B W |
Nuneaton Willesden Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1949 29/11/1952 14/10/1961 |
14/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 2569 | 9072 | 49072 | 10/1902 | 6B 6C 10E W |
Mold Junction Birkenhead Mollington Street Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1948 28/08/1948 26/02/1949 |
26/02/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1044 | 9376 | 49376 | 11/1902 | 9D 4B W |
Buxton (LNWR) Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/04/1948 31/03/1958 |
31/03/1958 | ||||
G1 | 1047 | 9387 | 49387 | 11/1902 | 25B 9D 3C 3A W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Buxton (LNWR) Ryecroft (Walsall) Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/04/1949 20/04/1957 10/08/1957 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1051 | 8922 | 48922 | 11/1902 | 2E 5C 3C 5C 5B W |
Warwick Stafford Ryecroft (Walsall) Stafford Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/03/1950 19/04/1952 26/03/1955 14/06/1958 09/05/1959 |
09/05/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1055 | 9377 | 49377 | 11/1902 | 21A 3A 10E 10E 2B 2A 2C 2A 26F 5C 21B 8A W |
Saltley Bescot Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Nuneaton Rugby Warwick Rugby Patricroft Stafford Bescot Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 27/05/1950 17/06/1950 26/03/1955 24/03/1956 23/03/1957 04/10/1958 28/03/1959 08/08/1959 17/09/1960 05/05/1962 27/10/1962 |
27/10/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1064 | 9607 | 8894 | 48894 | 11/1902 | 2B 11A W |
Bletchley Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 01/1949 |
01/1949 | |||
G1 | 1065 | 9340 | 49340 | 11/1902 | 2F 10C W |
Coventry Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 01/08/1959 |
01/08/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1066 | 9272 | 49272 | 12/1902 | 5B W |
Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1948 |
02/1948 | ||||
G1 | 1070 | 9120 | 49120 | 12/1902 | 6B 8C 2A 2A 2B 2B 2C 2B W |
Mold Junction Speke Junction Rugby Rugby Nuneaton Nuneaton Warwick Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 21/07/1951 11/08/1951 29/12/1951 09/10/1954 05/09/1959 |
05/09/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1088 | 8924 | 48924 | 12/1902 | 2E 2D W |
Warwick Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/03/1948 11/12/1948 |
11/12/1948 | ||||
G1 | 1094 | 9324 | 49324 | 12/1902 | 2C 5C 3C W |
Northampton Stafford Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 05/11/1949 04/03/1950 |
04/03/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1190 | 9076 | 49076 | 12/1902 | 2B 10C W |
Bletchley Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 05/1950 |
05/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1223 | 9368 | 49368 | 12/1902 | 2F 2D 8A 8C W |
Coventry Nuneaton Edge Hill Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/01/1949 29/12/1951 17/07/1954 07/03/1959 |
07/03/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1224 | 9350 | 49350 | 01/1903 | 3C 9D W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/05/1962 08/12/1962 |
08/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1225 | 8926 | 48926 | 01/1903 | 2A 8B 8B 10C W |
Rugby Warrington Dallam Warrington Dallam Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 29/04/1950 29/08/1959 |
29/08/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1226 | 8927 | 48927 | 01/1903 | 25D 8A 2B 8A W |
Mirfield Edge Hill Bletchley Edge Hill Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 01/01/1948 06/05/1950 30/01/1960 11/11/1961 |
11/11/1961 | ||||
G1 | 1227 | 9363 | 49363 | 01/1903 | 9A 5B W |
Longsight Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1228 | 9142 | 49142 | 01/1903 | 3A 9B 9B 2B 8A 8F 8A W |
Bescot Stockport Edgeley Stockport Edgeley Nuneaton Edge Hill Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 21/02/1953 28/01/1961 11/04/1961 17/06/1961 22/12/1962 |
22/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1229 | 9070 | 49070 | 01/1903 | 5B 2A 2A 2B 2B 91M 1A 1A 2A 1A 21C W |
Crewe South Rugby Rugby Bletchley Bletchley To London Midland Region Willesden Willesden Rugby Willesden Bushbury Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 04/06/1949 26/11/1949 24/12/1949 23/10/1950 27/12/1952 03/01/1953 23/02/1957 20/04/1957 14/01/1961 17/11/1962 |
17/11/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1230 | 9378 | 49378 | 01/1903 | 10D 6B 10A 10A W |
Plodder Lane Mold Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1949 14/01/1950 21/01/1950 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1231 | 9147 | 49147 | 01/1903 | 10D 10C W |
Plodder Lane Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1954 22/09/1962 |
22/09/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1236 | 9351 | 49351 | 01/1903 | 2D 2B W |
Nuneaton Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1949 12/11/1949 |
12/11/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1237 | 8929 | 48929 | 03/1903 | 2C 9B 10A 10A W |
Northampton Stockport Edgeley Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 20/11/1948 11/12/1948 29/07/1950 |
29/07/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1240 | 9358 | 49358 | 04/1903 | 4B W |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/03/1958 |
31/03/1958 | ||||
G1 | 1241 | 9346 | 49346 | 04/1903 | 2D 8A 10A 3B 3B 3D W |
Nuneaton Edge Hill Springs Branch (Wigan) Bushbury Bushbury Aston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 08/10/1949 26/08/1950 09/09/1950 24/03/1951 10/05/1952 |
10/05/1952 | ||||
G1 | 1242 | 9388 | 49388 | 04/1903 | 3C W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1951 |
03/1951 | ||||
G1 | 1243 | 9150 | 49150 | 04/1903 | 2D 10B 8D 8F W |
Nuneaton Preston Widnes Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/01/1949 04/10/1958 08/11/1958 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1245 | 9073 | 49073 | 04/1903 | 8D 10A W |
Widnes Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1956 11/01/1958 |
11/01/1958 | ||||
G1 | 1247 | 9613 | 8898 | 48898 | 04/1903 | 8A 4A 4A 9D W |
Edge Hill Bletchley Bletchley Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 03/02/1962 30/06/1962 |
30/06/1962 | |||
G1 | 1248 | 8930 | 48930 | 04/1903 | 10A 3A 3A 2A 3A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Bescot Bescot Rugby Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 25/02/1956 11/08/1956 08/12/1962 |
08/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1249 | 8931 | 48931 | 04/1903 | 2B 2D W |
Bletchley Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 06/1949 |
06/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1271 | 9145 | 49145 | 04/1903 | 1C 10A W |
Watford Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/08/1956 04/01/1958 |
04/01/1958 | ||||
G1 | 1272 | 8932 | 48932 | 05/1903 | 4D 8A 3C 9D W |
Abergavenny Edge Hill Ryecroft (Walsall) Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 11/08/1956 20/04/1957 07/10/1961 |
07/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 1404 | 8933 | 48933 | 05/1903 | 8A W |
Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1950 |
12/1950 | ||||
G1 | 2024 | 8934 | 48934 | 05/1903 | 11A 5B 4A W |
Carnforth Crewe South Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 23/10/1948 03/1950 |
03/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1274 | 9071 | 49071 | 05/1903 | 8D 3A 3A W |
Widnes Bescot Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 13/01/1951 |
13/01/1951 | ||||
G1 | 2571 | 8935 | 48935 | 05/1903 | 2B 9A W |
Bletchley Longsight Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 02/1949 |
02/1949 | ||||
G1 | 2572 | 8936 | 48936 | 05/1903 | 9D 2C 3A W |
Buxton (LNWR) Northampton Bescot Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 29/05/1948 05/1951 |
05/1951 | ||||
G1 | 2573 | 9373 | 49373 | 05/1903 | 5B 2A 3C 3A 2B 21B W |
Crewe South Rugby Ryecroft (Walsall) Bescot Nuneaton Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 05/11/1949 14/06/1958 15/07/1961 05/05/1962 08/12/1962 |
08/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 2574 | 9343 | 49343 | 05/1903 | 9A 8D 3C 3A W |
Longsight Widnes Ryecroft (Walsall) Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/08/1949 30/11/1957 14/06/1958 14/10/1961 |
14/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 2575 | 9394 | 49394 | 05/1903 | 25G 10A 8A 8A 11A 8A W |
Farnley Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Edge Hill Carnforth Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/04/1949 23/09/1950 07/10/1950 30/11/1957 25/01/1958 27/10/1962 |
27/10/1962 | ||||
G1 | 41 | 9362 | 49362 | 06/1903 | 3D W |
Aston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1948 |
08/1948 | ||||
G1 | 2080 | 8940 | 48940 | 06/1903 | 5C 3B W |
Stafford Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 11/05/1957 |
11/05/1957 | ||||
G1 | 1276 | 9389 | 49389 | 06/1903 | 25G 10E W |
Farnley Junction Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/04/1949 28/08/1954 |
28/08/1954 | ||||
G1 | 1277 | 9149 | 49149 | 06/1903 | 10A 8B 10B 10D 10C W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Warrington Dallam Preston Plodder Lane Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 21/03/1953 11/07/1953 09/10/1954 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1278 | 9381 | 49381 | 06/1903 | 25B 2D 10A W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Nuneaton Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/08/1949 11/03/1950 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1279 | 9352 | 49352 | 07/1903 | 2D 10A 8G 9D 8A 8F 8A W |
Nuneaton Springs Branch (Wigan) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Buxton (LNWR) Edge Hill Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/01/1949 11/04/1959 17/09/1960 01/10/1960 04/03/1961 11/04/1961 15/09/1962 |
15/09/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1280 | 9100 | 49100 | 07/1903 | 2B 8C 3C W |
Bletchley Speke Junction Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 29/10/1949 05/1950 |
05/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1283 | 8939 | 48939 | 07/1903 | 8D 3B W |
Widnes Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1948 11/1948 |
20/11/1948 | ||||
G1 | 2118 | 9292 | 49292 | 09/1903 | 15A 2B W |
Wellingborough Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 03/1951 |
03/1951 | ||||
G1 | 1284 | 8941 | 48941 | 09/1903 | 10C W |
Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/05/1950 |
06/05/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1285 | 9339 | 49339 | 09/1903 | 6C 2D 2B 2B W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Nuneaton Nuneaton Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/11/1949 17/07/1951 01/09/1951 08/09/1951 25/12/1954 |
25/12/1954 | ||||
G1 | 1286 | 9347 | 49347 | 09/1903 | 8D 9D W |
Widnes Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 01/01/1948 01/1951 |
01/1951 | ||||
G1 | 1287 | 8942 | 48942 | 09/1903 | 8C 8F W |
Speke Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/08/1959 07/10/1961 |
07/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 1288 | 8943 | 48943 | 09/1903 | 1A 2A 2A 8A 3C 3C 5C W |
Willesden Rugby Rugby Edge Hill Ryecroft (Walsall) Ryecroft (Walsall) Stafford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/07/1949 16/07/1949 19/11/1949 28/10/1950 04/11/1950 14/06/1958 05/09/1959 |
05/09/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1289 | 9361 | 49361 | 09/1903 | 3A 21C 21B 5B 2F W |
Bescot Bushbury Bescot Crewe South Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/11/1962 22/12/1962 28/12/1963 22/02/1964 26/12/1964 |
26/12/1964 | ||||
G1 | 1308 | 8944 | 48944 | 09/1903 | 8B 8C 8C W |
Warrington Dallam Speke Junction Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 18/12/1948 28/09/1957 |
28/09/1957 | ||||
G1 | 1310 | 8945 | 48945 | 10/1903 | 4A W |
Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/03/1959 |
06/03/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1318 | 9366 | 49366 | 10/1903 | 2D 4B 8D 8A W |
Nuneaton Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Widnes Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/02/1950 05/11/1955 08/11/1958 17/10/1959 |
17/10/1959 | ||||
G1 | 500 | 9265 | 49265 | 10/1903 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1952 |
04/1952 | ||||
G1 | 916 | 9354 | 49354 | 10/1903 | 3A 3C W |
Bescot Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/07/1953 03/03/1956 |
03/03/1956 | ||||
G1 | 2272 | 9360 | 49360 | 10/1903 | 21A 3A W |
Saltley Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1299 | 9074 | 49074 | 10/1903 | 8D 8C W |
Widnes Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1948 16/12/1950 |
16/12/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1401 | 9075 | 49075 | 10/1903 | 8B 3B 3B W |
Warrington Dallam Bushbury Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 28/01/1950 |
28/01/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1448 | 9273 | 49273 | 11/1903 | 10C 10C W |
Patricroft Patricroft Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 01/01/1948 02/1948 |
02/1948 | ||||
G1 | 2038 | 9356 | 49356 | 11/1903 | 3B 2B 1A W |
Bushbury Bletchley Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/01/1949 16/04/1949 04/1950 |
04/1950 | ||||
G1 | 2208 | 9364 | 49364 | 11/1903 | 3C W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1950 |
12/1950 | ||||
G1 | 640 | 9383 | 49383 | 01/1904 | 6B W |
Mold Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1948 |
05/1948 | ||||
G1 | 1300 | 9379 | 49379 | 01/1904 | 25G 3B W |
Farnley Junction Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/04/1949 08/10/1949 |
08/10/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1449 | 9122 | 49122 | 01/1904 | 15B 2B 1A 8F W |
Kettering Bletchley Willesden Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 22/07/1950 28/01/1961 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1586 | 9353 | 49353 | 01/1904 | 10C 4A 4A 8C W |
Patricroft Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 18/12/1948 25/12/1948 12/1949 |
12/1949 | ||||
G1 | 508 | 9090 | 49090 | 02/1904 | 10A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/12/1950 |
16/12/1950 | ||||
G1 | 641 | 9151 | 49151 | 02/1904 | 11A 9B 9B W |
Carnforth Stockport Edgeley Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/04/1951 19/05/1951 09/08/1952 |
09/08/1952 | ||||
G1 | 918 | 8948 | 48948 | 02/1904 | 4D 8A 4D W |
Abergavenny Edge Hill Abergavenny Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 13/11/1948 16/07/1949 |
16/07/1949 | ||||
G1 | 2036 | 9341 | 49341 | 02/1904 | 8C 10A W |
Speke Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/03/1948 23/03/1957 |
23/03/1957 | ||||
G1 | 410 | 9331 | 49331 | 04/1904 | 9D 10A W |
Buxton (LNWR) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1948 28/10/1950 |
28/10/1950 | ||||
G1 | 509 | 9069 | 49069 | 05/1904 | 2A 2C 1A W |
Rugby Northampton Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/08/1948 09/04/1949 17/06/1950 |
17/06/1950 | ||||
G1 | 647 | 9615 | 8899 | 48899 | 05/1904 | 4D 85C W |
Abergavenny Hereford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1955 03/03/1956 |
03/03/1956 | |||
G1 | 1110 | 9369 | 49369 | 05/1904 | 5B 3A W |
Crewe South Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 04/1950 |
04/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1122 | 9099 | 49099 | 05/1904 | 3A 21C W |
Bescot Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1962 21/07/1962 |
21/07/1962 | ||||
G1 | 503 | 9068 | 49068 | 05/1904 | 2D W |
Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/01/1957 |
19/01/1957 | ||||
G1 | 818 | 9132 | 49132 | 05/1904 | 9D 9D 8A W |
Buxton (LNWR) Buxton (LNWR) Edge Hill Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 03/01/1959 18/04/1959 |
18/04/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1585 | 9609 | 8895 | 48895 | 05/1904 | 4A 5B 3A 10A 10A 21C 2F W |
Shrewsbury Crewe South Bescot Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Bushbury Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 28/05/1949 27/05/1950 17/06/1950 18/08/1962 03/10/1964 05/12/1964 |
05/12/1964 | |||
G1 | 2056 | 9359 | 49359 | 05/1904 | 2B 10B 3A 3A W |
Bletchley Preston Bescot Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 02/02/1952 |
02/02/1952 | ||||
G1 | 2387 | 9357 | 49357 | 05/1904 | 5B 11A 8A 2C 10B 8D 5C W |
Crewe South Carnforth Edge Hill Northampton Preston Widnes Stafford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 12/02/1949 02/04/1949 25/01/1958 04/10/1958 08/11/1958 14/10/1961 |
14/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 437 | 9374 | 07/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1947 | 12/1947 | |||||
G1 | 644 | 8950 | 48950 | 07/1904 | 6B 2A 2A 3A 3B W |
Mold Junction Rugby Rugby Bescot Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/07/1949 16/07/1949 19/11/1949 30/11/1957 30/12/1961 |
30/12/1961 | ||||
G1 | 1353 | 9335 | 49335 | 07/1904 | 2F 3A 10C 10B 10C W |
Coventry Bescot Patricroft Preston Patricroft Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 01/01/1948 17/06/1950 21/04/1956 11/08/1956 29/09/1962 |
29/09/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1369 | 9372 | 49372 | 07/1904 | 2B W |
Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1432 | 9384 | 49384 | 07/1904 | 2E 3A W |
Warwick Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/06/1948 12/1948 |
12/1948 | ||||
G1 | 1436 | 8951 | 48951 | 08/1904 | 2B W |
Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/08/1957 |
31/08/1957 | ||||
G1 | 1543 | 8952 | 48952 | 08/1904 | 2B W |
Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/05/1957 |
18/05/1957 | ||||
G1 | 2057 | 9371 | 49371 | 08/1904 | 2B 10C 3A 3B 3B W |
Bletchley Patricroft Bescot Bushbury Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 25/02/1950 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 19/01/1952 |
19/01/1952 | ||||
G1 | 2060 | 9392 | 49392 | 08/1904 | 25G 10C 2A 8A 8A W |
Farnley Junction Patricroft Rugby Edge Hill Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/04/1949 08/07/1950 28/10/1950 04/11/1950 14/10/1961 |
14/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 2169 | 9393 | 49393 | 08/1904 | 1A 1C 10A 10A W |
Willesden Watford Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 28/10/1950 04/11/1950 22/06/1957 |
22/06/1957 | ||||
G1 | 2653 | 9154 | 49154 | 01/1910 | 2B 10A W |
Bletchley Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1951 07/10/1961 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 2654 | 9077 | 49077 | 01/1910 | 6B 1A 1C 1A W |
Mold Junction Willesden Watford Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/08/1950 28/10/1950 04/10/1952 15/12/1962 |
07/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 2655 | 9078 | 49078 | 01/1910 | 3A 1C 1A 1E 21B 1E W |
Bescot Watford Willesden Bletchley Bescot Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/11/1950 04/10/1952 28/01/1961 22/04/1961 27/01/1962 01/12/1962 |
15/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 2656 | 9079 | 49079 | 02/1910 | 8D W 8F 2B 21B |
Widnes Withdrawn Springs Branch (Wigan) Nuneaton Bescot |
01/01/1948 02/1950 08/11/1958 07/11/1959 05/05/1962 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 2657 | 9080 | 49080 | 02/1910 | 2D 8D W |
Nuneaton Widnes Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/10/1951 01/12/1962 |
02/1950 | ||||
G1 | 2658 | 9081 | 49081 | 02/1910 | 3A 10B 6B 6C 10A 8A 5C 21B W |
Bescot Preston Mold Junction Birkenhead Mollington Street Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Stafford Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/12/1948 01/10/1949 18/02/1950 08/04/1950 23/09/1950 30/11/1957 17/09/1960 15/10/1960 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 2659 | 9086 | 49086 | 02/1910 | 8C W |
Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/1950 |
04/1949 | ||||
G1 | 2660 | 9087 | 49087 | 02/1910 | 20B 10C W |
Stourton Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 09/1949 |
22/09/1962 | ||||
G1 | 2661 | 9088 | 49088 | 02/1910 | 11E 5B W 3A 4A 1A |
Tebay Crewe South Withdrawn Bescot Bletchley Willesden |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 04/1949 02/12/1950 24/02/1951 04/10/1952 |
16/11/1957 | ||||
G1 | 2662 | 9089 | 49089 | 02/1910 | 3A 3D W |
Bescot Aston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/07/1951 22/09/1962 |
14/01/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1354 | 9082 | 49082 | 03/1910 | 2D 10B 2A 2B 8A 4A 1A 85C 86K 84B 84G W 8A |
Nuneaton Preston Rugby Bletchley Edge Hill Bletchley Willesden Hereford Tredegar Oxley Shrewsbury Withdrawn Edge Hill |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 04/06/1949 26/11/1949 07/10/1950 28/02/1951 04/10/1952 14/07/1956 20/04/1957 18/05/1957 15/06/1957 16/11/1957 28/02/1959 |
15/10/1960 | ||||
G1 | 1380 | 9083 | 49083 | 03/1910 | 3A W 3D |
Bescot Withdrawn Aston |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 14/07/1951 |
01/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1411 | 9084 | 49084 | 03/1910 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1949 |
09/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1456 | 9092 | 49092 | 03/1910 | 9B 9D 9D 10A 3A 3A 3C 3D W |
Stockport Edgeley Buxton (LNWR) Buxton (LNWR) Springs Branch (Wigan) Bescot Bescot Ryecroft (Walsall) Aston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 18/12/1948 19/02/1949 03/03/1951 24/03/1951 29/12/1951 14/06/1952 27/09/1952 |
27/09/1952 | ||||
G1 | 1497 | 9093 | 49093 | 03/1910 | 2B 9D 5B 3A 8B 8B 10A 1E W |
Bletchley Buxton (LNWR) Crewe South Bescot Warrington Dallam Warrington Dallam Springs Branch (Wigan) Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/04/1948 24/04/1948 21/05/1949 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 16/07/1955 05/10/1957 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1556 | 9094 | 49094 | 03/1910 | 6C 2F 2F 10C 9G 10C 1E W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Coventry Coventry Patricroft Northwich Patricroft Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 23/07/1949 25/02/1950 05/09/1953 03/10/1953 11/08/1956 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1582 | 9095 | 49095 | 03/1910 | 10C W |
Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1948 |
06/1948 | ||||
G1 | 1591 | 9096 | 49096 | 03/1910 | 3A 4B 4B W |
Bescot Northampton Northampton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 05/04/1952 |
05/04/1952 | ||||
G1 | 1619 | 9097 | 49097 | 03/1910 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1950 |
03/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1629 | 9098 | 49098 | 03/1910 | 5C 9B 3A 3A W |
Stafford Stockport Edgeley Bescot Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 12/05/1951 |
12/05/1951 | ||||
G1 | 1322 | 9091 | 49091 | 04/1910 | 5C W |
Stafford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/09/1950 |
09/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1464 | 9101 | 49101 | 04/1910 | 6C 10D W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Plodder Lane Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1949 06/1949 |
30/09/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1511 | 9102 | 49102 | 04/1910 | 10B W |
Preston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 |
06/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1570 | 9103 | 49103 | 04/1910 | 2C 3A 2F 2F 10B 10B W |
Northampton Bescot Coventry Coventry Preston Preston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 16/07/1949 23/07/1949 07/01/1950 14/01/1950 01/12/1962 |
16/07/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1578 | 9104 | 49104 | 04/1910 | 11E 8A 8A 4B W 8F |
Tebay Edge Hill Edge Hill Northampton Withdrawn Springs Branch (Wigan) |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 05/03/1949 31/12/1950 14/11/1959 09/09/1961 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1600 | 9105 | 49105 | 05/1910 | 6B 4B 3B W |
Mold Junction Northampton Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 12/07/1952 15/12/1962 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1647 | 9106 | 49106 | 05/1910 | 3A 2D W 3B 3A 1E |
Bescot Nuneaton Withdrawn Bushbury Bescot Bletchley |
01/01/1948 30/10/1948 29/04/1950 12/07/1952 16/05/1953 27/01/1962 |
15/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1664 | 9107 | 49107 | 05/1910 | 2A 3C W |
Rugby Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/11/1952 23/11/1957 |
29/04/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1687 | 9108 | 49108 | 05/1910 | 9B 3C W |
Stockport Edgeley Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/11/1952 07/03/1959 |
23/11/1957 | ||||
G1 | 1699 | 9109 | 49109 | 05/1910 | 11A W 8C 2A 8C |
Carnforth Withdrawn Speke Junction Rugby Speke Junction |
01/01/1948 03/1949 21/04/1956 23/02/1957 20/04/1957 |
07/03/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1503 | 9110 | 49110 | 05/1910 | 3B W |
Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1540 | 9111 | 49111 | 05/1910 | 9B 9B 8C 8B 2B W |
Stockport Edgeley Stockport Edgeley Speke Junction Warrington Dallam Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/03/1948 23/02/1952 12/07/1952 29/11/1952 14/11/1959 |
03/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1609 | 9112 | 49112 | 06/1910 | 6B 11A 8C 8B 2B W |
Mold Junction Carnforth Speke Junction Warrington Dallam Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 23/02/1952 12/07/1952 29/11/1952 31/01/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1634 | 9113 | 49113 | 06/1910 | 4D 3A 6C 2A 86G W |
Abergavenny Bescot Birkenhead Mollington Street Rugby Pontypool Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 03/11/1951 10/11/1951 08/10/1955 01/12/1962 |
19/01/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1637 | 9114 | 49114 | 06/1910 | 2D 5C 3C 3A W 8A |
Nuneaton Stafford Ryecroft (Walsall) Bescot Withdrawn Edge Hill |
01/01/1948 05/11/1949 30/11/1957 14/06/1958 14/11/1959 18/11/1961 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1639 | 9115 | 49115 | 06/1910 | 6B W |
Mold Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1660 | 9116 | 49116 | 06/1910 | 5B 2D 5B 2A 8D 8D 3A 2A 84G 87K 8A W |
Crewe South Nuneaton Crewe South Rugby Widnes Widnes Bescot Rugby Shrewsbury Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/05/1948 12/06/1948 04/06/1949 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 05/05/1951 15/09/1951 22/03/1952 27/12/1952 08/11/1958 31/03/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1789 | 9117 | 49117 | 06/1910 | W 2B 1A 3A 2A 84G 84G 84G 87K 87K |
Withdrawn Bletchley Willesden Bescot Rugby Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
12/1947 01/01/1948 16/04/1949 19/05/1951 06/10/1951 23/02/1952 29/02/1952 30/04/1952 29/11/1952 27/12/1952 |
06/03/1959 | ||||
G1 | 2030 | 9118 | 49118 | 06/1910 | 6B 6C 8B W |
Mold Junction Birkenhead Mollington Street Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/10/1949 18/02/1950 08/04/1950 07/10/1961 |
12/1947 | ||||
G1 | 2032 | 9119 | 49119 | 06/1910 | 10B 4D 5C 8B W 26F |
Preston Abergavenny Stafford Warrington Dallam Withdrawn Patricroft |
01/01/1948 04/09/1948 28/12/1957 25/01/1958 30/09/1958 08/11/1958 |
07/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 1385 | 9121 | 49121 | 07/1910 | 15A 2B W |
Wellingborough Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 06/1949 |
30/09/1958 | ||||
G1 | 1492 | 9123 | 49123 | 07/1910 | 15A 2B W |
Wellingborough Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 01/1950 |
06/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1507 | 9124 | 49124 | 07/1910 | 10A 3B W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/04/1951 15/09/1962 |
01/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1539 | 9125 | 49125 | 08/1910 | 10A 1C 3B 8D 3A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Watford Bushbury Widnes Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/02/1951 19/05/1951 23/02/1952 01/01/1955 15/09/1962 |
15/09/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1577 | 9126 | 49126 | 08/1910 | 15B 8A W 1C 8D 5C 21B |
Kettering Edge Hill Withdrawn Watford Widnes Stafford Bescot |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 03/1950 24/02/1951 23/02/1952 08/11/1958 17/09/1960 |
15/09/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1606 | 9127 | 49127 | 08/1910 | 2B 1C 1A 1C W 1A |
Bletchley Watford Willesden Watford Withdrawn Willesden |
01/01/1948 01/05/1948 05/06/1948 17/07/1948 11/1948 12/02/1949 |
03/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1648 | 9128 | 49128 | 08/1910 | 1A W |
Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/12/1962 |
11/1948 | ||||
G1 | 1690 | 9129 | 49129 | 08/1910 | 10A 11A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/10/1949 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1774 | 9130 | 49130 | 08/1910 | 8A W 8A 5B 1E 8A |
Edge Hill Withdrawn Edge Hill Crewe South Bletchley Edge Hill |
01/01/1948 07/1948 15/11/1958 03/01/1959 20/06/1959 17/09/1960 03/06/1961 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1776 | 9131 | 49131 | 08/1910 | 3A 8C 8C W |
Bescot Speke Junction Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/08/1951 08/09/1951 31/03/1962 |
07/1948 | ||||
G1 | 1403 | 9134 | 49134 | 08/1910 | 10A 10B W 8F 2B 24K 24C 26F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Preston Withdrawn Springs Branch (Wigan) Nuneaton Preston Lostock Hall Patricroft |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 11/1949 17/07/1951 15/08/1959 07/11/1959 28/01/1961 16/09/1961 23/09/1961 |
31/03/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1424 | 9135 | 49135 | 08/1910 | 2F W 2A 3C |
Coventry Withdrawn Rugby Ryecroft (Walsall) |
01/01/1948 08/1948 21/08/1948 04/06/1949 |
11/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1462 | 9136 | 49136 | 09/1910 | 8B 8A W |
Warrington Dallam Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1948 07/10/1961 |
08/1948 | ||||
G1 | 1700 | 9137 | 49137 | 09/1910 | 8A 2A W |
Edge Hill Rugby Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 01/01/1948 02/02/1952 |
07/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 1727 | 9138 | 49138 | 09/1910 | 4A W |
Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1962 |
02/02/1952 | ||||
G1 | 1735 | 9139 | 49139 | 09/1910 | 1A W 8F |
Willesden Withdrawn Springs Branch (Wigan) |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 17/09/1955 19/04/1958 |
15/09/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1775 | 9140 | 49140 | 09/1910 | 8C W |
Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/12/1950 21/07/1962 |
17/09/1955 | ||||
G1 | 1794 | 9141 | 49141 | 09/1910 | 10A 10B 8C W 8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Preston Speke Junction Withdrawn Springs Branch (Wigan) |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 20/11/1948 24/10/1959 12/12/1959 |
21/07/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1788 | 9143 | 49143 | 09/1910 | 6B 8C 11A 8F W |
Mold Junction Speke Junction Carnforth Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 31/01/1951 15/08/1959 10/11/1962 |
24/10/1959 | ||||
G1 | 2014 | 9144 | 49144 | 09/1910 | 5C 2B 11A 9G 4A 10A 10A 2B 9A 2B 8A W |
Stafford Bletchley Carnforth Northwich Bletchley Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Nuneaton Longsight Nuneaton Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 27/01/1951 18/08/1951 01/09/1951 15/09/1951 09/10/1954 05/10/1957 28/12/1957 25/01/1958 30/01/1960 01/12/1962 |
10/11/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1329 | 9155 | 49155 | 02/1912 | 8A 2B 8C 10A 8A W |
Edge Hill Bletchley Speke Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/04/1949 28/11/1953 27/02/1954 27/08/1960 26/05/1962 |
26/05/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1384 | 9156 | 49156 | 02/1912 | 9B W |
Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/02/1951 |
03/02/1951 | ||||
G1 | 1426 | 9157 | 49157 | 02/1912 | 2C 1A 1C 8D 84G 91W 86G W |
Northampton Willesden Watford Widnes Shrewsbury To Western Region / GWR Pontypool Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1948 29/01/1949 23/02/1952 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 07/09/1957 31/01/1959 |
19/01/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1633 | 9158 | 49158 | 02/1912 | 2C 2A 6B 5C 5B W |
Northampton Rugby Mold Junction Stafford Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1948 15/01/1949 08/10/1949 14/06/1958 10/1962 |
10/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1697 | 9159 | 49159 | 02/1912 | 10A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1778 | 9160 | 49160 | 03/1912 | 3A 10A 10B 10B W |
Bescot Springs Branch (Wigan) Preston Preston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1950 28/10/1950 04/11/1950 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1791 | 9161 | 49161 | 03/1912 | 9B 4E W |
Stockport Edgeley Tredegar Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 30/04/1957 |
12/04/1957 | ||||
G1 | 2001 | 9162 | 49162 | 03/1912 | 2A 2D 3B 3C W |
Rugby Nuneaton Bushbury Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/10/1948 29/01/1949 12/07/1952 16/05/1953 |
16/05/1953 | ||||
G1 | 2015 | 9163 | 49163 | 03/1912 | 1A 10A 10A W |
Willesden Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/10/1950 04/11/1950 08/12/1951 |
08/12/1951 | ||||
G1 | 2034 | 9164 | 49164 | 03/1912 | 1A 8F W |
Willesden Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/01/1961 14/10/1961 |
14/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 1568 | 9165 | 49165 | 03/1912 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/09/1948 |
18/09/1948 | ||||
G1 | 1655 | 9166 | 49166 | 04/1912 | 6B 3B W |
Mold Junction Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/08/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1696 | 9167 | 49167 | 04/1912 | 2F 5B 3B W |
Coventry Crewe South Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 28/12/1957 |
28/12/1957 | ||||
G1 | 1698 | 9168 | 49168 | 04/1912 | 4E 4D 85C 86K 86G 86K W |
Tredegar Abergavenny Hereford Tredegar Pontypool Road Tredegar Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/04/1948 04/12/1954 29/01/1955 08/10/1955 05/10/1957 25/01/1958 |
25/01/1958 | ||||
G1 | 1783 | 9169 | 49169 | 04/1912 | 2C W |
Northampton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1949 |
12/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1162 | 9170 | 49170 | 05/1912 | 8D W |
Widnes Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 |
16/07/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1505 | 9171 | 49171 | 05/1912 | 9A 9B 3C W |
Longsight Stockport Edgeley Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/11/1949 18/03/1950 02/1952 |
02/1952 | ||||
G1 | 1790 | 9172 | 49172 | 04/1912 | 6C 8C 2A 2A 2B 2B W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Speke Junction Rugby Rugby Nuneaton Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/11/1949 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 25/08/1951 08/09/1951 10/08/1957 |
10/08/1957 | ||||
G1 | 2018 | 9173 | 49173 | 04/1912 | 2B 8A 8A W |
Bletchley Edge Hill Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/09/1950 07/10/1950 18/07/1964 |
18/07/1964 | ||||
G1 | 2104 | 9174 | 49174 | 05/1912 | 4E 4D 86G 86K W |
Tredegar Abergavenny Pontypool Road Tredegar Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/04/1948 08/10/1955 05/10/1957 22/02/1958 |
22/02/1958 | ||||
G1 | 2119 | 9175 | 49175 | 05/1912 | W 3A |
Withdrawn Bescot |
01/1948 01/01/1948 |
01/1948 | ||||
G1 | 2284 | 9176 | 49176 | 05/1912 | 10E 10A W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 14/01/1950 |
14/01/1950 | ||||
G1 | 2254 | 9177 | 49177 | 05/1912 | 3A 4B W |
Bescot Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/06/1948 28/02/1959 |
02/02/1959 | ||||
G1 | 2337 | 9178 | 49178 | 06/1912 | 8B 10C W |
Warrington Dallam Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/04/1950 05/1951 |
05/1951 | ||||
G1 | 2345 | 9179 | 49179 | 06/1912 | 2B 2F W |
Bletchley Coventry Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 18/12/1948 |
18/12/1948 | ||||
G1 | 2349 | 9180 | 49180 | 06/1912 | 3A 1A 1A 5B W |
Bescot Willesden Willesden Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 22/02/1958 07/03/1959 |
07/03/1959 | ||||
G1 | 2385 | 9181 | 49181 | 06/1912 | 2D 2E 8A 2B 2B W |
Nuneaton Warwick Edge Hill Bletchley Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/03/1948 14/01/1950 03/06/1950 17/06/1950 04/04/1959 |
04/04/1959 | ||||
G1 | 2393 | 9182 | 49182 | 06/1912 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1947 | 12/1947 | ||||
G1 | 674 | 9183 | 49183 | 07/1912 | 9A W |
Longsight Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1950 |
06/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1746 | 9184 | 49184 | 07/1912 | 5B 8B 8C W |
Crewe South Warrington Dallam Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 05/06/1948 01/1949 |
01/1949 | ||||
G1 | 955 | 9185 | 49185 | 10/1912 | 9B W |
Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1108 | 9186 | 49186 | 10/1912 | 9B 9A 2B 3D W |
Stockport Edgeley Longsight Nuneaton Aston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/07/1948 08/07/1950 19/06/1954 14/09/1957 |
14/09/1957 | ||||
G1 | 2162 | 9187 | 49187 | 10/1912 | 9B W |
Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/02/1952 |
16/02/1952 | ||||
G1 | 2225 | 9188 | 49188 | 10/1912 | 11A W |
Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/09/1949 |
10/09/1949 | ||||
G1 | 2281 | 9189 | 49189 | 10/1912 | 3A 3D W |
Bescot Aston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/03/1953 26/01/1957 |
26/01/1957 | ||||
G1 | 2289 | 9190 | 49190 | 11/1912 | 2D 10A 10C W |
Nuneaton Springs Branch (Wigan) Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/02/1948 28/08/1948 02/1950 |
02/1950 | ||||
G1 | 2301 | 9191 | 49191 | 11/1912 | 2D 10B 9B 8F W |
Nuneaton Preston Stockport Edgeley Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/07/1948 15/11/1958 02/01/1960 14/10/1961 |
14/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 2374 | 9192 | 49192 | 11/1912 | 10A 10B W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Preston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 11/1949 |
11/1949 | ||||
G1 | 328 | 9193 | 49193 | 12/1912 | 2B 3C W |
Bletchley Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 11/1951 |
11/1951 | ||||
G1 | 631 | 9194 | 49194 | 12/1912 | 5C W |
Stafford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1949 |
10/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1529 | 9195 | 49195 | 12/1912 | 3A 3C W |
Bescot Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 | ||||
G1 | 2091 | 9196 | 49196 | 12/1912 | 3B 10B 10E 24L W |
Bushbury Preston Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 09/09/1961 14/10/1961 |
14/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 2286 | 9197 | 49197 | 12/1912 | 10A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1948 |
05/1948 | ||||
G1 | 2380 | 9198 | 49198 | 11/1912 | 5E 3C W 5C |
Alsager Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn Stafford |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 29/05/1948 26/03/1955 |
29/05/1948 | ||||
G1 | 2405 | 9199 | 49199 | 11/1912 | 10C W |
Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/09/1962 |
22/09/1962 | ||||
G1 | 2421 | 9200 | 49200 | 12/1912 | 2A 2A 10B 8A 8A W |
Rugby Rugby Preston Edge Hill Edge Hill Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 10/07/1948 23/09/1950 07/10/1950 28/03/1959 |
28/03/1959 | ||||
G1 | 326 | 9201 | 49201 | 01/1913 | 2B 2F W |
Bletchley Coventry Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 19/06/1948 |
19/06/1948 | ||||
G1 | 633 | 9202 | 49202 | 01/1913 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/10/1957 |
05/10/1957 | ||||
G1 | 1192 | 9203 | 49203 | 01/1913 | 2C 10D 10A W |
Northampton Plodder Lane Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1948 09/10/1954 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 2245 | 9204 | 49204 | 01/1913 | 3B W |
Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/04/1951 |
07/04/1951 | ||||
G1 | 107 | 9205 | 49205 | 06/1913 | 2C 5B 5B 2A 10E 10E W |
Northampton Crewe South Crewe South Rugby Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 18/12/1948 04/06/1949 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 04/1951 |
04/1951 | ||||
G1 | 93 | 9206 | 49206 | 07/1913 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1947 | 12/1947 | ||||
G1 | 138 | 9207 | 49207 | 07/1913 | 10A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 |
16/07/1949 | ||||
G1 | 670 | 9208 | 49208 | 07/1913 | 2B 10A 3C W |
Bletchley Springs Branch (Wigan) Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 11/03/1950 02/1951 |
02/1951 | ||||
G1 | 734 | 9209 | 49209 | 07/1913 | 5B 2D 10C W |
Crewe South Nuneaton Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/05/1949 14/01/1950 14/10/1961 |
14/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 787 | 9210 | 49210 | 07/1913 | 5B 9D W |
Crewe South Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1951 14/10/1961 |
14/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 1127 | 9211 | 49211 | 07/1913 | 3A 3C 3D 2D W |
Bescot Ryecroft (Walsall) Aston Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 07/08/1948 30/10/1948 09/1949 |
09/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1128 | 9212 | 49212 | 08/1913 | 9D 10E 8C 3A 2B 2B 2C 2B W |
Buxton (LNWR) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Speke Junction Bescot Nuneaton Nuneaton Warwick Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 09/04/1949 02/12/1950 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 03/11/1951 29/12/1951 21/04/1956 |
21/04/1956 | ||||
G1 | 2201 | 9213 | 49213 | 08/1913 | 2B 2A 3C W |
Bletchley Rugby Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 04/06/1949 09/1951 |
09/1951 | ||||
G1 | 2378 | 9214 | 49214 | 08/1913 | 9D 8C W |
Buxton (LNWR) Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/04/1957 10/08/1957 |
10/08/1957 | ||||
G1 | 43 | 9215 | 49215 | 08/1913 | 6B W |
Mold Junction Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 12/1947 |
12/1947 | ||||
G1 | 669 | 9216 | 49216 | 08/1913 | 9D 3A W |
Buxton (LNWR) Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1948 24/11/1962 |
24/11/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1314 | 9217 | 49217 | 08/1913 | 15A 2B W |
Wellingborough Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 02/1949 |
02/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1343 | 9218 | 49218 | 09/1913 | 8C W |
Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1951 |
03/1951 | ||||
G1 | 2117 | 9219 | 49219 | 09/1913 | 6B 8C W |
Mold Junction Speke Junction Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 30/09/1950 |
30/09/1950 | ||||
G1 | 2195 | 9220 | 49220 | 09/1913 | 6B 6C 5B W |
Mold Junction Birkenhead Mollington Street Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1948 02/10/1948 04/02/1950 |
04/02/1950 | ||||
G1 | 2246 | 9221 | 49221 | 09/1913 | 10A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1949 |
09/1949 | ||||
G1 | 2258 | 9222 | 49222 | 09/1913 | 6B 3C W |
Mold Junction Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 29/09/1951 |
29/09/1951 | ||||
G1 | 2390 | 9223 | 49223 | 09/1913 | 15A 2A 3A 3A W |
Wellingborough Rugby Bescot Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 11/12/1948 18/12/1948 06/04/1957 |
06/04/1957 | ||||
G1 | 2452 | 9224 | 49224 | 10/1913 | 9D 10D 8A W |
Buxton (LNWR) Plodder Lane Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 05/03/1949 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 20 | 9225 | 49225 | 03/1914 | 9D W |
Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/03/1948 |
20/03/1948 | ||||
G1 | 131 | 9226 | 49226 | 03/1914 | 4D 85C 87K W |
Abergavenny Hereford Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/01/1955 20/04/1957 31/03/1959 |
06/03/1959 | ||||
G1 | 795 | 9227 | 49227 | 03/1914 | 9A 8B W |
Longsight Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 02/1949 |
02/1949 | ||||
G1 | 329 | 9228 | 49228 | 04/1914 | 6B 10A 10A W |
Mold Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 21/01/1950 04/04/1959 |
04/04/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1181 | 9229 | 49229 | 04/1914 | 10B 2A 6B 6B 6C 5C 5B 3B W |
Preston Rugby Mold Junction Mold Junction Birkenhead Mollington Street Stafford Crewe South Bushbury Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 31/12/1949 14/01/1950 18/02/1950 08/04/1950 14/06/1958 07/11/1959 19/11/1960 |
19/11/1960 | ||||
G1 | 1214 | 9230 | 49230 | 04/1914 | 5B W |
Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1957 |
30/11/1957 | ||||
G1 | 1486 | 9231 | 49231 | 03/1914 | 10B W |
Preston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1948 |
02/1948 | ||||
G1 | 1500 | 9232 | 49232 | 04/1914 | 5B 8D 10C W |
Crewe South Widnes Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 10/07/1948 17/06/1950 |
17/06/1950 | ||||
G1 | 2033 | 9233 | 49233 | 04/1914 | 3B W |
Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/05/1948 |
22/05/1948 | ||||
G1 | 2200 | 9234 | 49234 | 04/1914 | 10C 5C W |
Patricroft Stafford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/08/1959 25/06/1960 |
25/06/1960 | ||||
G1 | 108 | 9235 | 49235 | 05/1914 | 6B W |
Mold Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/02/1950 |
11/02/1950 | ||||
G1 | 175 | 9236 | 49236 | 05/1914 | 3C W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/03/1948 |
13/03/1948 | ||||
G1 | 351 | 9237 | 49237 | 05/1914 | 2B W |
Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1949 |
31/12/1949 | ||||
G1 | 965 | 9238 | 49238 | 06/1914 | 10C W |
Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1949 |
07/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1142 | 9239 | 49239 | 05/1914 | 8A 3C 8A 10E 10E W |
Edge Hill Ryecroft (Walsall) Edge Hill Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/04/1951 28/04/1951 05/05/1951 19/05/1951 09/1957 |
09/1957 | ||||
G1 | 1485 | 9240 | 49240 | 06/1914 | 9D 3B W |
Buxton (LNWR) Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1948 15/09/1962 |
15/09/1962 | ||||
G1 | 2336 | 9241 | 49241 | 05/1914 | 5B 11A 5B 5B 8A 11A 3C 3C W |
Crewe South Carnforth Crewe South Crewe South Edge Hill Carnforth Ryecroft (Walsall) Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 11/12/1948 18/12/1948 12/02/1949 08/10/1949 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 20/09/1952 |
20/09/1952 | ||||
G1 | 2379 | 9242 | 49242 | 05/1914 | 8A 4D 8C W |
Edge Hill Abergavenny Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 11/09/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 | ||||
G1 | 2058 | 9243 | 49243 | 06/1914 | 4D 84G 8A W |
Abergavenny Shrewsbury Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/12/1954 23/05/1959 11/03/1961 |
11/03/1961 | ||||
G1 | 2156 | 9244 | 49244 | 06/1914 | 1A 2A 6C 8C 2A 2A W |
Willesden Rugby Birkenhead Mollington Street Speke Junction Rugby Rugby Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 08/02/1936 01/01/1948 12/11/1949 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 04/1952 |
04/1952 | ||||
G1 | 2237 | 9245 | 49245 | 06/1914 | 3A 2A 26F W |
Bescot Rugby Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1954 28/03/1959 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 | ||||
G1 | 48 | 9246 | 49246 | 07/1914 | 6C 2E 3A 1E W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Warwick Bescot Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/11/1949 14/01/1950 18/11/1961 13/01/1962 |
13/01/1962 | ||||
G1 | 62 | 9247 | 49247 | 07/1914 | 8B 3B 3B W |
Warrington Dallam Bushbury Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 19/05/1951 16/11/1957 |
16/11/1957 | ||||
G1 | 72 | 9248 | 49248 | 07/1914 | 3C 3D W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Aston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 | ||||
G1 | 99 | 9249 | 49249 | 07/1914 | 1C 1A 8C 8B 8B 2A 3C 26F W |
Watford Willesden Speke Junction Warrington Dallam Warrington Dallam Rugby Ryecroft (Walsall) Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 19/03/1949 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 16/07/1955 30/11/1957 14/06/1958 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 | ||||
G1 | 176 | 9250 | 49250 | 07/1914 | 10B W |
Preston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/04/1948 |
10/04/1948 | ||||
G1 | 203 | 9251 | 49251 | 07/1914 | W 6B |
Withdrawn Mold Junction |
01/1948 01/01/1948 |
01/1948 | ||||
G1 | 931 | 9252 | 49252 | 08/1914 | 11E 11A 11A W |
Tebay Carnforth Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 31/12/1950 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 2094 | 9253 | 49253 | 08/1914 | 8C 10A W |
Speke Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1951 15/03/1952 |
15/03/1952 | ||||
G1 | 2234 | 9254 | 49254 | 08/1914 | 10C W |
Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1957 |
13/04/1957 | ||||
G1 | 170 | 9255 | 49255 | 05/1916 | 10C W |
Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1950 |
03/1950 | ||||
G1 | 545 | 9256 | 49256 | 05/1916 | 6C W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 | ||||
G1 | 885 | 9257 | 49257 | 05/1916 | 10A 10D 6B 6B 11A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Plodder Lane Mold Junction Mold Junction Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 31/12/1949 14/01/1950 11/02/1950 04/11/1950 |
04/11/1950 | ||||
G1 | 942 | 9258 | 49258 | 05/1916 | 6C 3C W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/11/1949 03/1951 |
03/1951 | ||||
G1 | 982 | 9259 | 49259 | 05/1916 | 3A 10A 10E W |
Bescot Springs Branch (Wigan) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 02/10/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1167 | 9260 | 49260 | 05/1916 | 2B 4B 84G W |
Bletchley Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 01/01/1948 31/12/1951 30/04/1958 |
30/04/1958 | ||||
G1 | 1217 | 9261 | 49261 | 05/1916 | 6B 3D W |
Mold Junction Aston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/04/1949 10/03/1951 |
10/03/1951 | ||||
G1 | 1528 | 9262 | 49262 | 06/1916 | 1C 6C 10E 8A 9D W |
Watford Birkenhead Mollington Street Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Edge Hill Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/06/1949 12/11/1949 17/09/1960 01/10/1960 08/12/1962 |
08/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1729 | 9263 | 49263 | 06/1916 | 1A 5B 10A W |
Willesden Crewe South Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 05/06/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 | ||||
G1 | 2288 | 9264 | 49264 | 06/1916 | 2D 10A W |
Nuneaton Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 13/01/1951 |
13/01/1951 | ||||
G1 | 94 | 9268 | 49268 | 11/1917 | 2D 10A W |
Nuneaton Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1950 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 112 | 9269 | 49269 | 10/1917 | 11A W |
Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1949 |
09/1949 | ||||
G1 | 360 | 9270 | 49270 | 11/1917 | 2C 2B W |
Northampton Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/11/1958 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 851 | 9271 | 49271 | 11/1917 | 2C 5B 5B 8A 8A 3C W |
Northampton Crewe South Crewe South Edge Hill Edge Hill Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 31/10/1953 02/11/1957 |
02/11/1957 | ||||
G1 | 2088 | 9274 | 49274 | 10/1917 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/04/1948 |
10/04/1948 | ||||
G1 | 2256 | 9275 | 49275 | 10/1917 | 5B 5B 1A 3A 3D 3A W |
Crewe South Crewe South Willesden Bescot Aston Bescot Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 24/04/1948 06/10/1956 23/02/1957 29/11/1958 14/10/1961 |
14/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 2290 | 9276 | 49276 | 11/1917 | 4D 4A 4A W |
Abergavenny Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 12/1958 |
12/1958 | ||||
G1 | 2296 | 9277 | 49277 | 11/1917 | 1A 9D 2B W |
Willesden Buxton (LNWR) Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/08/1959 06/01/1962 17/02/1962 |
17/02/1962 | ||||
G1 | 2274 | 9278 | 49278 | 11/1917 | 2F 2A 3A 3D 3D 3C 3A W |
Coventry Rugby Bescot Aston Aston Ryecroft (Walsall) Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/05/1948 06/11/1948 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 05/10/1957 14/06/1958 24/10/1959 |
24/10/1959 | ||||
G1 | 2423 | 9279 | 49279 | 12/1917 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/02/1950 |
11/02/1950 | ||||
G1 | 83 | 9280 | 49280 | 01/1918 | 6B W |
Mold Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/09/1949 |
17/09/1949 | ||||
G1 | 720 | 9281 | 49281 | 01/1918 | 8C 9D 9B 10E 9D W |
Speke Junction Buxton (LNWR) Stockport Edgeley Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/07/1948 21/08/1948 09/10/1954 17/01/1959 08/12/1962 |
08/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 750 | 9282 | 49282 | 01/1918 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/1957 |
01/1957 | ||||
G1 | 943 | 9283 | 49283 | 01/1918 | 3C 3B 2D W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Bushbury Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 16/07/1949 |
16/07/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1121 | 9284 | 49284 | 01/1918 | 9A 5B 6B 5C W |
Longsight Crewe South Mold Junction Stafford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 30/04/1949 08/10/1949 03/1950 |
03/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1313 | 9285 | 49285 | 02/1918 | 9A 1A 1A 3C W |
Longsight Willesden Willesden Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 18/12/1948 16/04/1949 07/1949 |
07/1949 | ||||
G1 | 2082 | 9286 | 49286 | 02/1918 | W 3A |
Withdrawn Bescot |
24/04/1946 01/01/1948 |
24/04/1946 | ||||
G1 | 2167 | 9287 | 49287 | 02/1918 | 8A 4D 8A 9A 2B W |
Edge Hill Abergavenny Edge Hill Longsight Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/08/1948 18/09/1948 19/03/1949 20/08/1949 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 2172 | 9288 | 49288 | 02/1918 | 15A 10A 10A 10E 10E W |
Wellingborough Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/03/1951 24/03/1951 05/05/1951 19/05/1951 14/10/1961 |
14/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 2412 | 9289 | 49289 | 03/1918 | 15A 2B W |
Wellingborough Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1129 | 9290 | 49290 | 03/1918 | 15A 2B W |
Wellingborough Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1614 | 9291 | 49291 | 03/1918 | 6B 5C W |
Mold Junction Stafford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/11/1949 20/05/1950 |
20/05/1950 | ||||
G1 | 2150 | 9293 | 49293 | 03/1918 | 8C 2E 2B 8A W |
Speke Junction Warwick Nuneaton Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/09/1950 07/10/1950 05/05/1962 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 2250 | 9294 | 49294 | 03/1918 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1949 |
31/12/1949 | ||||
G1 | 2297 | 9295 | 49295 | 04/1918 | 3B W |
Bushbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 |
14/08/1948 | ||||
G1 | 2343 | 9296 | 49296 | 04/1918 | 5B 1A 2D W |
Crewe South Willesden Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 11/12/1948 05/1951 |
05/1951 | ||||
G1 | 230 | 9297 | 49297 | 05/1918 | 8C 10B W |
Speke Junction Preston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/03/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 | ||||
G1 | 264 | 9298 | 49298 | 05/1918 | 9A 8A 1A W |
Longsight Edge Hill Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 07/05/1949 31/12/1949 |
31/12/1949 | ||||
G1 | 2376 | 9299 | 49299 | 04/1918 | 10B W |
Preston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 |
16/07/1949 | ||||
G1 | 2410 | 9300 | 49300 | 04/1918 | 2B 3C W |
Bletchley Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/04/1949 24/11/1951 |
24/11/1951 | ||||
G1 | 2422 | 9301 | 49301 | 04/1918 | 3A 8A 3C 3C 26F W |
Bescot Edge Hill Ryecroft (Walsall) Ryecroft (Walsall) Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/07/1950 28/04/1951 19/05/1951 14/06/1958 14/03/1959 |
14/03/1959 | ||||
G1 | 2441 | 9302 | 49302 | 05/1918 | 8B 8C 8C 10C 10C W |
Warrington Dallam Speke Junction Speke Junction Patricroft Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 18/12/1948 12/05/1951 19/05/1951 12/1951 |
12/1951 | ||||
G1 | 880 | 9303 | 49303 | 05/1918 | 10E W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 |
27/11/1948 | ||||
G1 | 1071 | 9305 | 49305 | 05/1918 | 9D 9B W |
Buxton (LNWR) Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1657 | 9306 | 49306 | 06/1918 | 10A 10A 8C W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 05/10/1957 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1693 | 9307 | 49307 | 06/1918 | 2B W |
Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/09/1950 |
30/09/1950 | ||||
G1 | 2066 | 9308 | 49308 | 06/1918 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/04/1959 |
04/04/1959 | ||||
G1 | 2199 | 9309 | 49309 | 06/1918 | 3D W |
Aston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/07/1948 |
03/07/1948 | ||||
G1 | 2235 | 9310 | 49310 | 07/1918 | 10A 4A 4A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Bletchley Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 14/10/1961 |
14/10/1961 | ||||
G1 | 2253 | 9311 | 49311 | 07/1918 | 10A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/10/1959 |
10/10/1959 | ||||
G1 | 757 | 9312 | 49312 | 07/1918 | 10E W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1951 |
04/1951 | ||||
G1 | 829 | 9313 | 49313 | 07/1918 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/12/1961 |
16/12/1961 | ||||
G1 | 894 | 9314 | 49314 | 07/1918 | 11A 8A 2B 8F W |
Carnforth Edge Hill Nuneaton Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/12/1951 26/03/1955 05/05/1962 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1107 | 9315 | 49315 | 08/1918 | 9D 10D 5B 10A 9D W |
Buxton (LNWR) Plodder Lane Crewe South Springs Branch (Wigan) Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 24/12/1949 09/10/1954 05/10/1957 27/06/1959 |
27/06/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1435 | 9316 | 49316 | 08/1918 | 6B 3A 4D 4D W |
Mold Junction Bescot Abergavenny Abergavenny Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 31/01/1957 |
24/01/1957 | ||||
G1 | 1495 | 9317 | 49317 | 08/1918 | 10E W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1950 |
03/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1785 | 9318 | 49318 | 09/1918 | 2D 5B 10E W |
Nuneaton Crewe South Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/07/1953 02/01/1954 02/11/1957 |
02/11/1957 | ||||
G1 | 2054 | 9320 | 49320 | 09/1918 | 5C W |
Stafford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1949 |
12/1949 | ||||
G1 | 2160 | 9321 | 49321 | 09/1918 | 2C 10A W |
Northampton Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/01/1958 25/06/1960 |
25/06/1960 | ||||
G1 | 2236 | 9322 | 49322 | 09/1918 | 6B 9D 9A 10A 10A W |
Mold Junction Buxton (LNWR) Longsight Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/05/1948 29/05/1948 10/03/1951 24/03/1951 10/03/1956 |
10/03/1956 | ||||
G1 | 172 | 9323 | 49323 | 10/1918 | 1C 10A 8B 26F W |
Watford Springs Branch (Wigan) Warrington Dallam Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/08/1956 08/09/1956 08/11/1958 22/09/1962 |
22/09/1962 | ||||
G1 | 1261 | 9325 | 49325 | 11/1918 | 3C W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/11/1949 |
12/11/1949 | ||||
G1 | 1306 | 9326 | 49326 | 10/1918 | 9D 3C W |
Buxton (LNWR) Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1948 01/08/1953 |
01/08/1953 | ||||
G1 | 1487 | 9327 | 49327 | 10/1918 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1793 | 9328 | 49328 | 10/1918 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 | ||||
G1 | 2287 | 9329 | 49329 | 10/1918 | 21A 3A W |
Saltley Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 | ||||
G1 | 279 | 9330 | 49330 | 11/1918 | 10C 2D 1E 2A 1E W |
Patricroft Coventry Bletchley Rugby Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/07/1950 28/01/1956 23/02/1957 20/04/1957 07/03/1959 |
07/03/1959 | ||||
G1 | 1158 | 9332 | 49332 | 11/1918 | 2B 2E 2A 2F 3A W |
Bletchley Warwick Rugby Coventry Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 12/06/1948 28/05/1949 16/07/1949 29/07/1950 |
29/07/1950 | ||||
G1 | 1359 | 9333 | 49333 | 11/1918 | 1A 8A W |
Willesden Edge Hill Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 01/01/1948 20/05/1950 |
20/05/1950 | ||||
G1 | 2497 | 9334 | 49334 | 12/1918 | 1A 3A W |
Willesden Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 09/1950 |
09/1950 | ||||
G1 | 2524 | 9011 | 49011 | 10/1892 | 3D W |
Aston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1949 |
31/12/1949 |